HI SB980 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 227, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 227, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Defines, for the purpose of compulsory education, a private school to be an education institution that teaches kindergarten through grade twelve and that is licensed or accredited by specified licensing or accrediting organizations. Effective 7/1/2020. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 227, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 227, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 24). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Rhoads, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-22 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Takumi, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 813). |
2019-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Takumi Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2019-04-12 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899). |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 532). |
2019-04-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1931), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2019-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1540) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to LHE, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 22). |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 134) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB409 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.