HI SB979 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a healthy families initiative pilot program; appropriates funds. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; Wellness; Healthy Families; Pilot Program; Appropriation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-12-01 Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
2011-02-14 (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2011-02-14 (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 150) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2011-02-02 (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom.
2011-01-28 (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2011-01-24 (S) Referred to HTH, WAM.
2011-01-24 (S) Passed First Reading.
2011-01-21 (S) Introduced.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback