HI SB978 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB978

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain public buildings near mass transit projects and on Hawaiian home lands to display portraits of Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-10SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 101) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HWN, WAM.
2021-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-27SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB978 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback