HI SB978 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB978
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain public buildings near mass transit projects and on Hawaiian home lands to display portraits of Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Prince Jonah Kuhio Kalanianaole.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 101) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB978 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.