HI SB975 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB975
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures for audits of pharmacies conducted by a health care provider, insurance company, third-party payor, sickness insurance provider, mutual benefit society, dental service corporation, health maintenance organization, or any entity that represents such companies or groups. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Pharmacy Audits.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 122) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 622) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 499) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-17-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-21 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1134 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB975 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21
SB975 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21