HI SB975 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the High Technology Investment credit, also known as Act 221, to provide an aggregate cap on the amount of high technology business investment tax credit issued per year.
Title
Income Tax; High Technology Business Investment Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in EDT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2009-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-13-09 1:00 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-09 1:15pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1157 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=975&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/SB975_.htm |