HI SB974 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB974
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/HUS, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/HUS, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the exemption from payment of parking meter fees to vehicles that display a distinguishing parking permit or decal issued to an applicant who presents a certificate of disability that verifies that the applicant is licensed to drive a motor vehicle and cannot reach or operate a parking meter because of a physical disability. Takes effect 7/1/2018. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Parking For Disabled Persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT/HUS, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 315) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from TRE/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 382) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Dela Cruz, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-09-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE deferred the measure until 02-08-17 1:40PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-07-17 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to TRE/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB974 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/HUS, TRN, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB1108 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
HB1108 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TRN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).