HI SB952 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB952
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a parolee higher education pilot program that allows parolees to take classes up to twelve semester credits at no charge to the parolee; provided that the classes are taken within five years after release from a correctional institution and provided further that the parolee does not break or violate the terms of parole and other laws. Sunsets June 1, 2025.
Title
Relating To Parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB952 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=952&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB952_.HTM |