HI SB945 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows cooperative housing corporations, associations of apartment owners, and condominium associations to adopt rules to prohibit smoking in units or apartments if a majority of the tenant shareholders or owners approved the smoking prohibition; provided that no such rule shall take effect until one hundred eighty days after the prohibition is approved. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)
Title
Smoking; Condominiums; Cooperative Housing Corporations; Prohibition by Rule
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 251) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-20-13 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 82) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Slom. |
2013-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB34 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.