HI SB942 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB942

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds to the Department of Land and Natural Resources to procure, install, and operate a machine or system to clean trash out of the Ala Wai canal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Ala Wai Canal.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to WTL/AEN, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB942 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL/AEN, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback