HI SB942 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Act 008, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Act 008, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 328L-3, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to remove the specific percentage of tobacco settlement moneys that is to be deposited to the Emergency and Budget Reserve Fund.
Title
Relating To The Emergency And Budget Reserve Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Act 008, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Act 008, 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1108). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 452). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1579), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2017-02-17 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-02-16 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 12). |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-16-17. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 272) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Wakai. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1076 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=942&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB942_.HTM |