HI SB941 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii Health Systems Corporation to conduct FBI criminal history record checks through the Hawaii Criminal Justice Data Center on employees, applicants, current or prospective contractors, providers, or volunteers. (SD1)
Title
Hawaii Health Systems Corporation; Background Checks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2009-02-20 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Nishihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-18-09 2:40 PM in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-09 3:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HTH, JGO. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1123 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.