HI SB940 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires direct payment for the provision of pre-hospital ambulance treatment and transport services. Requires insurance entities contracting with the State to provide Medicaid coverage to enter into written contracts with a minimum of 50 percent of hospitals and providers in their coverage area. Effective July 1, 2020. (SB940 HD1)
Title
Insurance; Direct Payment; Healthcare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-04-30 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-30-09 at 5:30pm in Conference Room 229. | |
2009-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-09 2:15pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-09 2:00 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-09 1:00pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-23 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-09 10:35am in conference room 229. | |
2009-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 655). | |
2009-04-20 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Herkes Co-Chairs; Nishimoto, Wakai, Marumoto. | |
2009-04-13 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 483). | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Ige, Chair; Baker, Co-Chair(s); Green, Hemmings. | |
2009-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 476). | |
2009-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-09. | |
2009-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 384). | |
2009-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takai excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2009-04-06 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1490), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-30 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Wakai, Belatti, Cabanilla, Karamatsu, Luke, McKelvey, Morita, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, Mizuno. | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, McKelvey, Pine, Takai, Tokioka excused (6). | |
2009-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-30-09 2:15pm in House conference room 325. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1304) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2009-03-24 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno, Shimabukuro; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll. | |
2009-03-20 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-24-09 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 28 | |
2009-03-12 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2009-03-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2009-03-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-09. | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2009-03-06 | (S) Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 575) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Green, Baker, Espero, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. | |
2009-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Sakamoto, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2009-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN deferred the measure until 02-25-09 2:45pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-09 3:00pm in conference room 016. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) Re-Referred to HTH/CPN. | |
2009-01-30 | (S) Referred to HTH, CPN. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1122 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.