HI SB939 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Act 009, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Act 009, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the investment and funds management functions of the Department of Budget and Finance. (SD1)
Title
Relating To State Funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Act 009, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Act 009, 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 451). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1578), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2017-02-22 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-02-21 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 16) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda). Transmitted to House. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-21-17. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 535) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Taniguchi. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1073 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5