HI SB938 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Referred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for (4.0) FTE positions for services and programs at the University of Hawaii at Manoa Native Hawaiian Student Services. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The University Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE/WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 300) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-03-01Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-03-01SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 942) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:25AM in conference room 211.
2019-02-15SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2019-02-15SenateReported from HRE/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 492) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, J.Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Ihara.
2019-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on HRE/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-19 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to HRE/HWN, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback