HI SB935 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB935
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for two water reuse demonstration projects. (SB935 HD1)
Title
Relating To Capital Improvement Projects For Water Reuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1463) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-15 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Har, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Friday, 03-15-19 10:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-01 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 12) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-28-19. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 667) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB935 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Yamane excused (2).