HI SB934 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB934
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-27 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Make housekeeping amendments.
Title
Relating To The State And County Contributions To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB934 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
HB1068 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
HB1068 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Oshiro excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=934&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB934_.HTM |