HI SB934 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires establishment and implementation of a bullying and cyberbullying policy for all public schools and charter schools. Establishes bullying and cyberbullying reporting requirements for all public schools and charter schools. Defines "bullying", "cyberbullying", and "harassment". Requires the department of education and the charter school review panel to report to the legislature annually. Effective July 1, 2050. (SB934 HD2)
Title
Bullying; Cyberbullying
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-24 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1201) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Carroll, Souki. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Wooley excused (6). | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 981) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Takumi, Belatti, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Mizuno, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Saiki, Takai, Wooley, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Chang. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-16-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EDN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 217) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Solomon, Wakai . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Kouchi). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 584) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 184) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 02-09-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDU, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |