HI SB930 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-28 - Referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of taxation to provide a biennial report on tax expenditures to the legislature on or before September 15th of each odd-numbered year. Requires legislation establishing new tax expenditures to include certain specified provisions. Effective 7/1/2017.
Title
State Tax Expenditures; Biennial Report; Evaluation
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=930&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SB930_.HTM |