HI SB923 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB923
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines "swimming pool" for the purposes of administrative rules to mean impervious, artificial bodies of water used for swimming, diving, or recreational bathing or therapy.
Title
Relating To Pools.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-10-21 1:30PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB923 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
HB104 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
HB104 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=923&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB923_.HTM |