HI SB921 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB921

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credit by reducing the cap amount per qualified production to $12,000,000. Requires the Department of Taxation to make a public disclosure identifying the names of the taxpayers who are receiving the tax credits and the total amount of tax credit received. Establishes an exception to the general prohibition against the Department of Taxation disclosing tax returns and return information. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-23HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
2021-03-23HouseReported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1230), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-17HouseThe committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi, Okimoto; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2021-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-17-21 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 303) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 871) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-19SenateReported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 490) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Lee.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-21 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to EET, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1174 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB921 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto, Wildberger voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback