HI SB92 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1381).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows surviving immediate family members of murder or manslaughter victims to receive a copy of the closing report prepared by the investigating police department upon the conclusion of all criminal and civil proceedings that arose from the offense. (SB92 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Police Reports.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateVetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1381).
2019-07-09HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1381).
2019-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-04-18SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-04-18HouseReceived notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 914).
2019-04-18SenatePassed Final Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 813).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Morikawa, Thielen.
2019-04-17SenateOne Day Notice 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateSenate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-18-19.
2019-04-17SenateReconsideration of action taken on 04-05-19 in disagreeing to the House amendments.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateDeferred One Day 04-04-19.
2019-04-02SenateDeferred One Day 04-03-19.
2019-04-02SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 521).
2019-04-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McKelvey, Quinlan, Saiki, Todd, Tokioka excused (6). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
2019-03-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1906) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Say.
2019-03-14HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-03-14HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-19 at 2:00pm.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 43) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 797) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-02-14SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 345) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Harimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-17SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2019-01-17SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback