HI SB917 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the broadband infrastructure grant program to award grants to applicants to extend deployment of infrastructure used to provide broadband service to unserved areas of the State. Amends the Hawaii technology loan revolving fund to change it to the Hawaii broadband infrastructure fund, including the types of funds deposited into the fund. Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds for the broadband infrastructure grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Broadband Service Infrastructure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29SenateReferred to GVO, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1191 (Same As) 2021-04-21 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 11:05AM in conference room CR 325.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback