HI SB916 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB916
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the board of land and natural resources make certain determinations before approving public land dispositions. Restricts the board of land and natural resources from approving the disposition of public lands under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating To The Disposition Of Public Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB916 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to WTL, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=916&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB916_.HTM |