HI SB915 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB915

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Uniform Probate Code to allow courts to appoint emergency guardians for respondents who reside in psychiatric facilities, hospitals, and homeless shelters. Extends the appointment period. Clarifies that guardians may consent to care, treatment, or service over the objection of wards. Sunsets 1/1/2028.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Guardianship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-11 Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
2023-01-27SenateReferred to HHS, JDC.
2023-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB915 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, JDC.
HB1154 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback