HI SB911 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB911
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to improve health care services related to cardiac care at Hilo Medical Center. (SB911 HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 757). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2164) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-19-19 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 291) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1087) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 149) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB911 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918).