HI SB91 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB91
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Higher Education & Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Special Funds of the University of Hawaii and the Hawaii Cancer Research Special Fund to submit annual detailed reports to the Legislature. (SD3)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 88) in amended form (SD 3). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2850) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 3). |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2512) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 2) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HRE. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2041) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HRE. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE will hold a public decision making on 02-01-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB91 (Carry Over) 2021-01-22 - Referred to HRE.
Subjects
Administrative Expense Assessment
Hawaii Cancer Research Special Fund
Special Funds of the University of Hawaii
Hawaii Cancer Research Special Fund
Special Funds of the University of Hawaii