HI SB907 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB907

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes enhanced public notice requirements for change in land use by the department of Hawaiian home lands, department of land and natural resources, or the university of Hawaii and boundary changes by the land use commission. Requires approval of the project by the community through a referendum of nearby adult residents except for projects within the Mauna Kea science reserve, which require a referendum by all adult residents of the county in which the Mauna Kea science reserve is located. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Public Notice.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HWN/WTL, JDC/WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB907 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to HWN/WTL, JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback