HI SB907 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB907
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes "every fifth year reporting" requirement by the greenhouse gas emissions reduction task force to the Legislature and changes who is authorized to appoint the panel to conduct the evaluation of the energy systems development special fund projects.
Title
Relating To Reporting By The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from ETT/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 474) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-17 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to ETT/HRE, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1041 (Same As)
SB907 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB907 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=907&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB907_.HTM |