HI SB905 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB905
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the state council on mental health to include an unspecified number of members with demonstrated knowledge of or work experience involving native Hawaiian health practices. Takes effect 5/6/2137. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The State Council On Mental Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Bennette Misalucha [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 300) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 847) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HWN/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 435) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Ihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HTH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-21 1:03PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 1:03PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HTH, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB905 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22