HI SB902 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB902

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes within the department of land and natural resources a Makua Valley task force to prepare for the transition of the management of the Makua military reservation from the United States Army upon the expiration of the Army's lease for the land. Requires a report to the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Federal Lands.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to PSM/WTL, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB547 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB902 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to PSM/WTL, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback