HI SB900 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB900
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of human services to collect and report data on severe maternal morbidity incidents, disaggregated by county, race, and ethnicity. Requires the department of human services to develop and the Hawaii state commission on the status of women to administer implicit bias training for health care professionals in perinatal facilities. Effective 5/1/2029. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Maternal Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Laura Acasio [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 299) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 772) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HMS/HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 301) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 3:00PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB900 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on HHH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB698 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB698 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1