HI SB892 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB892
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits doctors, advanced practice registered nurses with prescriptive authority, and physician assistants, when providing emergency services at a hospital from: prescribing any long-acting opioid painkiller, prescribing more than a seven-day supply of any other opioid painkiller, or refilling prescriptions for opioid painkillers. Provides exceptions. Establishes penalties.
Title
Relating To Emergency Services.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB892 (Carry Over) 2019-01-30 - Re-Referred to CPH, JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=892&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB892_.HTM |