HI SB89 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB89
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the implementation date from December 31, 2023, to December 31, 2021, for the requirement that qualifying patients shall obtain medical cannabis or manufactured cannabis products only from a licensed dispensary or by cultivating cannabis as permitted by law. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HTH. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 756) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HTH. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH will hold a public decision making on 02-10-21 1:35PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HTH. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB89 (Carry Over) 2021-03-05 - Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HTH.