HI SB882 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Act 010, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the month of October as "Farm to School Month in Hawaii."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Farm To School Month In Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26HouseAct 010, on 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
2017-04-26SenateAct 010, 04/26/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1110).
2017-04-10SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2017-04-11SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 543).
2017-04-07HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-04-07HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1710), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-04-03HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, McKelvey.
2017-03-30HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-17 2:00PM in conference room 309.
2017-03-29HouseThe committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2017-03-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-29-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2017-03-22HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on EDN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen excused (3).
2017-03-22HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1211), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDN.
2017-03-15HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, LoPresti, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-03-15HouseBroadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
2017-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-15-17 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2017-02-15HouseReferred to AGR, EDN, referral sheet 20
2017-02-10HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 4).
2017-02-10SenatePassed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
2017-02-09SenateOne Day Notice 02-10-17.
2017-02-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading.
2017-02-09SenateReported from AEN/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 105) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
2017-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman.
2017-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-17 2:15PM in conference room 224.
2017-01-25SenateReferred to AEN/EDU.
2017-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-25SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1016 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to AGR, JUD, referral sheet 5

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback