HI SB864 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that a minimum of two of the three auditors selected by the authorizer for the State's public charter schools have offices on the neighbor islands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Charter Schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseReferred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 296).
2021-03-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-05SenateOne Day Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 864) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-10SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2021-02-10SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 122) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 229.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback