HI SB853 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB853

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates a state lottery division within the department of budget and finance with rulemaking authority to implement a state lottery limited to the Powerball and Mega Millions lottery games. Allocates lottery profits to the general fund. Creates lottery and lottery prizes revolving fund. Establishes the Hawaii gaming corporation for the purpose of conducting gambling in Hawaii. Allocates proceeds to capital improvements at public schools and the University of Hawaii system, scholarships and educational loan repayments for medical students who practice in Hawaii for ten years, support for the family practice rural residency program, watershed protection, and reduction and prevention of problem gambling. Appropriates funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Generation Of State Revenues.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-08SenateRe-Referred to JDC/WAM.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to PSM, JDC/WAM.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB853 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to JDC/WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback