HI SB853 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB853
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a state lottery division within the department of budget and finance with rulemaking authority to implement a state lottery limited to the Powerball and Mega Millions lottery games. Allocates lottery profits to the general fund. Creates lottery and lottery prizes revolving fund. Establishes the Hawaii gaming corporation for the purpose of conducting gambling in Hawaii. Allocates proceeds to capital improvements at public schools and the University of Hawaii system, scholarships and educational loan repayments for medical students who practice in Hawaii for ten years, support for the family practice rural residency program, watershed protection, and reduction and prevention of problem gambling. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Generation Of State Revenues.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB853 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Re-Referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Department of Budget and Finance
Gambling
Hawaii Gambling Corporation ($)
Mega Millions
Powerball
State Lottery
Gambling
Hawaii Gambling Corporation ($)
Mega Millions
Powerball
State Lottery
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=853&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB853_.HTM |