HI SB851 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB851
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that certain small wireless facilities and associated modified or replaced utility poles shall be classified as permitted uses and shall not be subject to zoning review or zoning approval if they are deployed in an underserved area or unserved area. Defines "underserved area" and "unserved area". (SD1)
Title
Relating To Wireless Broadband Networks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 361) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-21 3:00PM in conference room 016. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB851 (Carry Over) 2021-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.