HI SB85 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB85

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands to engage in lottery and bingo enterprises pursuant to state law. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Hawaiian Affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-16SenateThe recommendation was not adopted.
2021-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keohokalole ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-16-21 1:02PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-12SenateRe-Referred to HWN, WAM/JDC.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to HWN.
2021-02-12SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 228) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to HWN.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on HWN will hold a public decision making on 02-11-21 1:01PM; Via Videoconference.
2021-01-22SenateReferred to HWN.
2021-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB85 (Carry Over) 2021-02-16 - The recommendation was not adopted.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback