HI SB848 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that 0.5 per cent, rather than one per cent, of state fund appropriations for capital improvements shall be transferred into the works of art special fund. Limits the 0.5 per cent amount to appropriations designated for the construction of new state buildings, properties, or facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Works Of Art Special Fund.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24SenateReferred to LCA/GVO, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB373 (Same As) 2019-02-07 - The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback