HI SB848 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB848
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the Hawaiian Language College's functions. Authorizes a Hawaiian language medium general education coursework pilot project. Supports the development of an implementation plan for Hawaiian language instruction throughout the University of Hawaii System. Requires the University of Hawaii to report to the Legislature each year with information about efforts to implement education taught through the Hawaiian language. (SB848 HD2)
Title
Relating To Higher Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Ing. |
2017-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-21-17 2:02PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (4). |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1108) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2017-03-14 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-13 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Tuesday, 03-14-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 273) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 883) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Wakai. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDL will hold a public decision making on 02-28-17 9:50AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDL. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HRE/HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 504) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDL. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE/HWN, WAM/JDL. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Kim. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/HWN has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/HWN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/HWN deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HRE/HWN, WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB848 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
HB950 (Same As) 2017-01-31 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB950 (Same As) 2017-01-31 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaiian Language College
Hawaiian Language Instruction Implementation Plan
Hawaiian Language Medium General Education Coursework Pilot Project
University of Hawaii at Hilo
Hawaiian Language Instruction Implementation Plan
Hawaiian Language Medium General Education Coursework Pilot Project
University of Hawaii at Hilo