HI SB840 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB840
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the elections commission to refer a complaint to the attorney general or county prosecutor in addition to any administrative determination and without the requirement that the commission believes the respondent has recklessly, knowingly, or intentionally committed a violation. Disqualifies a person convicted of violating elections criminal prosecution laws from holding elective public office for ten years, rather than four. Repeals language stipulating that elections criminal prosecution law does not apply to any person who has paid or agreed to pay fines related to report filing violations and advertisement violations prior to the commencement of the proceedings.
Title
Relating To Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 294) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB840 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=840&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB840_.HTM |