HI SB838 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB838

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows the executive office of aging to relax the thirty-hour employment requirement for qualified caregivers under the kupuna caregivers program during a governor-declared state of emergency. Allows the kupuna caregivers program to be delivered through either traditional service delivery or kupuna caregiver-directed services. Clarifies that coaches and service providers shall be mandated reporters who have received adult protective services training. Expands the duties of a coach to include assisting the care recipient and caregiver with the enrollment process. Allows funds under the kupuna caregivers program to be issued to the care recipient's financial management service provider. Requires the director of the executive office on aging to submit an annual report to the legislature and adopt administrative rules. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Services For Kupuna.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-04-19SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
2021-04-16HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Johanson, Tam Co-Chairs; Har, Ward.
2021-04-15HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792).
2021-04-15SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Misalucha.
2021-04-13HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788).
2021-04-13SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2021-04-13SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 474).
2021-04-09HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-04-09HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1816), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-04-01HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Perruso.
2021-03-25HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1488) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2021-03-24HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-03-19HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
2021-03-19HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1046) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-03-09HouseReferred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21
2021-03-09HousePass First Reading
2021-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 117) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04SenateOne Day Notice 03-05-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 624) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-19SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2021-02-19SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 419) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-29SenateReferred to HMS, CPN.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB491 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB838 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 2:30PM; CR 329.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback