HI SB824 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB824

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides ranked choice method of voting for all partisan primary elections, special elections, and nonpartisan general elections held in this State on or after 1/1/2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-17SenateRe-Referred to JDC, WAM.
2017-11-30 Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to JDL, WAM.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB824 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback