HI SB823 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB823
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires insurers, mutual benefit societies, fraternal benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for health care services provided by a naturopathic physician. Requires the insurance commissioner to receive and investigate complaints regarding discrimination with respect to participation under a health insurance plan against any health care provider. Effective 6/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Naturopathic Physicians.
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 268) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 738) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 489) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB823 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27