HI SB822 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB822
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "rebuilt vehicle" to include vehicles that have been rebuilt after being declared a total loss due to flood damage and material damage to the vehicle's electronics. (SB822 HD1)
Title
Relating To Rebuilt Vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1632) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 265) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee on CPH has rescheduled its decision making to 02-26-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 358) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS, CPH. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS/CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB822 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
HB270 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 199, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).
HB270 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 199, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).