HI SB812 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB812
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the superintendent to serve as the summer learning coordinator and coordinate all summer programs for children. Requires the summer learning coordinator to leverage certain federal funds for school-based summer programs. Effective 7/1/50. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-12 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-12-21 10:05AM; CR211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 33) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB612 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB812 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
SB812 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.