HI SB811 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of public safety to provide security at the Hawaii state hospital. Requires a report to the legislature on strategies and plans to address the needs for appropriate security and the needs of the increasing and aging forensic population at the Hawaii state hospital.
Title
Department of Public Safety; Security of Hawaii State Hospital
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee on PGM deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee on HTH deferred the measure. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HTH/PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=811 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB811_.HTM |