HI SB80 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB80
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the bureau of conveyance to amend its rules to establish a new fee schedule for certain general, land court, and regular system fees. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Economy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments And Be Recommitted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and recommitted to EET. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 108) as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of recommittal to EET. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS and be recommitted. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET will hold a public decision making on 02-08-21 3:10PM in conference room 224. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EET. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB80 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM.